PINDERFIELDS DISABILITY SPORTS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide coaching & facilities to disabled memberst. Also provide finacial support to members to enter competition
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 04 May 1964: Standard registration
- 14 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PINDERFIELS FELLOWSHIP CLUB FOR PARAPLEGIC PATIENTS (Previous name)
- THE PINDERFIELDS PARAPLEGIC FELLOWSHIP CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £893 | £1.23k | £995 | £1.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.01k | £720 | £948 | £685 | £1.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 03 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 07 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 15 August 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 04 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/11/1972 AS AMENDED ON 24/04/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SOME FORM OF PHYSICAL DISABILITY IN ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- 1) BY PROVIDING A MEANS WHEREBY SUCH PERSONS MAY MEET AND BY CORPORATE EFFORT BENEFIT THEMSELVES AS A GROUP AND AS INDIVIDUALS. 2) BY PROMOTING AN INTEREST IN SPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SUCH SPORT. 3) BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO INCREASE THE HAPPINESS AND WELL-BEING OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window