Trustees LEY HILL WAR MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 228467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH PETERSON Chair
None on record
Anne Lee Trustee 30 January 2023
None on record
Rebecca Gorst Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Christine Lewis Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Andy Rennard Trustee 13 March 2019
None on record
Dr Peter Churchill Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Angela Gregory Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
DAVID DARVELL Trustee 05 February 2013
None on record
NEIL LAMOND Trustee
None on record
REG GREGORY Trustee
None on record
Dr MICHAEL APPLEBY Trustee
None on record
IAN WALTER Trustee
None on record