THE FRIENDS OF THE STAMFORD HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS, FOR EXAMPLE BY BOOK SALES IN THE OUTPATIENT DEPARTMENT AND EVENTS SUCH AS THE CHRISTMAS QUIZ AND SANTA FUN RUN. WE WORK TO ARTICULATE LOCAL VIEWS ON THE IMPORTANCE OF THE HOSPITAL TO LOCAL PEOPLE. THE COMMITTEE MEETS REGULARILY TO RECEIVE AND DECIDE ON REQUESTS FOR THE USE OF OUR FUNDS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
- Lincolnshire
- Northamptonshire
- Rutland
Governance
- 11 December 1963: Standard registration
- The Friends of Stamford Hospital (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Lumb | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Anne Banner | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Marion Pitt | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jonathan William Morris Jones | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
Dr Vivien Jane Mitchell | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
PATRICIA MONICA MASON | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Fiona Christina Ruddick | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
David Robert Baxter | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Douglas Matthew | Trustee | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
KAY HIRCOCK | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.48k | £6.43k | £6.31k | £6.23k | £6.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.09k | £4.25k | £2.01k | £1.90k | £14.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF SOCIETY 1963 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
STAMFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Haddon Road
STAMFORD
Lincolnshire
PE9 2UW
- Phone:
- 01780 763333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window