Accounts and annual returns THE MANCHESTER HOMOEOPATHIC CLINIC

Charity number: 228481
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 02 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 10 November 2014 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 04 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 19 September 2013 323 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required