Governing document JOHN EATON'S ALMSHOUSES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 13 APRIL 1978 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 14 DECEMBER 1994 AND RESOLUTION OF 9 NOVEMBER 2009 AND SCHEME OF 24 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 JANUARY 1939 FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT.IF SUITABLE PERSONS CANNOT BE FOUND WITHIN THE AREA DEFINED ABOVE THEN THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER SUCH OTHER SUITABLY QUALIFIED PERSONS RESIDING WITHIN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.