BETHANY HOMES, CAMBORNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Homes for the residence of persons over the age of sixty who in the absolute discretion of the trustees shall by reasons of their straitened but secure financial circumstances be considered suitable persons as residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 13 November 1963: Standard registration
- BETHANY HOMES (Working name)
- Homes England
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lavinia Buhagiar | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susanna Thomas | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SARAH VIVIAN KIND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.19k | £37.67k | £36.00k | £35.77k | £34.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.49k | £33.26k | £64.39k | £25.89k | £29.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 31ST DECEMBER 1938
Charitable objects
HOMES FOR THE RESIDENCE AND USE OF PERSONS (PREFERABLE THOSE CONNECTED WITH THE FORMER WESLEYAN METHODIST CHURCH) OF GOOD CHARACTER AND MORAL WORTH WHO ARE IN STRAITENED FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Churchtown House
8 Churchtown Road
Gwithian
HAYLE
Cornwall
TR27 5BX
- Phone:
- 07713400071
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window