Trustees TARSET VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 228521

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Richard Holland | Chair | 09 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Lynne Hood | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
INGRID CARR | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Dodds | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Byrom | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Valerie Giles | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Richard Coxon | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM BRODIE | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Nixon | Trustee | 09 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA BRODIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Hazel Ions | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.