LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 228524
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of housing accommodation for beneficiaries and charitable purposes for the benefit of the residents.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £20,568
Total expenditure: £15,825

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON CUNDALL Chair 01 July 2024
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Jean Jarvis MBE Trustee 01 July 2024
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
Hilary Delaney Hall Trustee 01 July 2024
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
Tim Gill Trustee 01 July 2024
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
Juliet Diamond Trustee 01 July 2024
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
MARK PAINTER Trustee 01 July 2024
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
Imogen Liddle Trustee 01 July 2024
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Thomas O'Boyle Trustee 01 July 2014
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Rev John Beesley Trustee 08 October 2012
None on record
Nicholas Holcombe Trustee 18 April 2012
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER WILLIAMS Trustee
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £19.52k £14.99k £38.14k £29.85k £20.57k
Total expenditure £8.66k £8.66k £45.13k £42.48k £15.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 05 January 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 05 January 2024 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 10 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 10 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 JOCKEY FIELD
LUDLOW
SY8 1PU
Phone:
01584874661
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available