THE ABBEYFIELD SOLIHULL SOCIETY LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Solihull
Governance
- 16 October 1963: Standard registration
- 28 October 2004: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 28 October 2004: Funds transferred to 200719 THE ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY
- ABBEYFIELD SOLIHULL (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 7TH FEBRUARY 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AGED IMPOTENT AND POOR PEOPLE OF ALL CLASSES FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
SOLIHULL AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window