UNITE THE UNION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE BENEVOLENT FUND FOR MEMBERS AND STAFF OF UNITE THE UNION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 March 1964: Standard registration
- BANKING INSURANCE AND FINANCE UNION BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- UNIFI BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM HARPER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Skinner | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.92k | £206.75k | £190.56k | £107.90k | £166.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.20k | £235.79k | £165.36k | £111.29k | £133.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2024 | 326 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 September 2024 | 326 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND REGULATIONS DATED DECEMBER 1964 AS AMENDED 11TH APRIL 1979 AND 12TH MARCH 1991 AND 17 MARCH 1998, AND 15 NOVEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROVIDE BENEFITS TO MEMBERS OR EMPLOYEES OR EX-EMPLOYEES OF UNITE THE UNION OR ANY SUCCESSOR UNION (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE UNION") OR THEIR DEPENDANTS, WHO MAY BE IN DISTRESSED CIRCUMSTANCES; (B) TO CONSIDER APPLICATIONS FROM THE PUBLIC WHETHER MEMBERS OF THE UNION OR NOT, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE FUND; (C) TO MAKE MONETARY GRANTS OR DONATIONS OR RENDER OTHER ASSISTANCE TO ANY INSTITUTION OR ASSOCIATION WHICH CAN ALSO RENDER BENEFITS OR ASSISTANCE TO DISTRESSED PERSONS AS MORE SPECIFICALLY REFERRED TO IN CLAUSES (A) OR (B) ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unite the Union
Unite House
128 Theobalds Road
LONDON
WC1X 8TN
- Phone:
- 020 7611 2500
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window