THE SOUTH TYNESIDE BLIND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides small grants for visually impaired people, who are residents of South Tyneside, to contribute to or pay for specialist goods or services which will improve the quality of their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 18 August 1970: Standard registration
- THE SOUTH SHIELDS BLIND WELFARE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE SOUTH SHIELDS INSTITUTION FOR THE BLIND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Lamonte | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Bennetts | Trustee | 19 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHIELA CAWKWELL | Trustee | 01 March 2012 |
|
|||||
MARIAN ELIZABETH STEAD | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.10k | £2.52k | £2.27k | £2.77k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £638 | £720 | £120 | £219 | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 18/08/1970 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 02/05/2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF SOUTH TYNESIDE WHO ARE BLIND OR WHO ARE SUBSTANTIALLY AND PERMANENTLY HANDICAPPED BY DEFECTIVE VISION.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF SOUTH SHIELDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 YORK AVENUE
JARROW
NE32 5LP
- Phone:
- 01914475581
- Email:
- marian.44@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window