Financial history CARLTON CHARITY LANDS

Charity number: 228622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k £1.80k £2.03k
Total expenditure £1.53k £138 £1.27k £357 £4.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A