THE GEPP CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Has one property
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 21 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr. Abdul Hafiz Cllr | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Cllr Abdul Hafiz | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Board Cllr | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Miller Cllr | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.41k | £3.40k | £3.66k | £3.24k | £4.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.17k | £3.37k | £55 | £2.59k | £2.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 20/1/1950
Charitable objects
AQUISITION OF A SUITABLE PIECE OF A LAND WITH OR WITHOUT BUILDINGS THEREON FOR THE ERECTION OF TWO OR MORE HOMES FOR THE AGED, IN POOR CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
OLD WARD OF THE BOROUGH OF MALDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 ESSEX ROAD
MALDON
CM9 6JQ
- Phone:
- 01621856297
- Email:
- helphil@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window