DIAL POST VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pilates, aerobics/yoga, table tennis, flamenco dancing, bowls, bingo, whist drive, bird club, history club, band practices, exhibitions, local -, parish council -, WI -, WSCC meetings, private parties and dances; catering for all ages.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 October 1963: Standard registration
- THE DIAL POST VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN CHILDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lee Wiginton | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul-lee Windmil | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brad Albrecht | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Grout | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcella O'Reardon | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHILDS | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steven Alexander | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS PAILINE SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.44k | £2.79k | £14.06k | £17.35k | £30.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.81k | £8.19k | £13.73k | £15.34k | £30.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATION AND ENTERTAINMENT OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF DIAL POST.
Area of benefit
DIAL POST AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
PLATTS GREEN COTTAGE
HONEYBRIDGE LANE
DIAL POST
HORSHAM
RH13 8NX
- Phone:
- 01403710388
- Email:
- DPVHall@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window