Register of Charities - The Charity Commission GREEK CATHEDRAL CEMETERY ENCLOSURES TRUST FUND
Charity number: 265710-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 DECEMBER 1860 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 DECEMBER 2002 AND BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 26 JUNE 2003..
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF BURIAL GROUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE INTERMENT OF MEMBERS OF THE GREEK COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND TO HOLD TRUST MONEYS ON TRUST TO BE APPLIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH DIRECTIONS OF GREEK COMMUNITY IN LONDON.
Area of benefit
LONDON.
Registration history
- 04 June 1973: Standard registration
- 12 December 2016: Removed (Duplicate registration)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.