HYDE WAR MEMORIAL TRUST (LOWER HIGHAM FARM)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The 1924 Deed states that the land should remain unbuilt upon and used for the resort and recreation of the inhabitants of the Borough of Hyde. The Trust maintains the Cenotaph on the top of Werneth Low. The 1924 Deed states that a wreath be laid at the Cenotaph on the 25th June each year to commemorate the signing of the Versailles Treaty which ended World War 1.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 30 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Durkin | Chair | 18 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Lee Howard Davenport | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carole Longson | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phil Chadwick | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rilly Shibley Alam | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD EKIN | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ellis | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Plackett | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Bell | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Halliday | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Betty Affleck | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER AINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.84k | £24.34k | £18.83k | £34.41k | £39.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.36k | £4.59k | £63.32k | £8.59k | £34.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 136 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 136 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11 FEBRUARY 1924 AND SCHEME OF 5 MARCH 1976
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF A WAR MEMORIAL ON WERNETH LOW HYDE AND THE HOLDING OF LOWER HIGHAM FARM HYDE, FOR THE GENERAL GOOD RESORT USE AND RECREATION OF THE BOROUGH OF HYDE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF HYDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hyde War Memorial Trust
Lower Higham Visitor Centre
Higham Lane
HYDE
Cheshire
SK14 5LR
- Phone:
- 01613686667
- Email:
- hydewmt@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window