NORTHBROOK COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charitable Trust typically supports Devon charities/organisations who focus on the care, education and training of children and young people under 25.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,316 from 1 government contract(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 12 April 1966: Standard registration
- NORTHBROOK COMMUNITY HOME (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ANDY CHAPMAN | Chair | 11 September 2009 |
|
|||||
David Law | Trustee | 29 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Jayne Elizabeth Maisey | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Monica Mary Mortimer | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Adams | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Boles | Trustee | 19 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Heather Margaret Morgan | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Rupert Thistlethwayte | Trustee | 12 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Bright | Trustee | 11 September 2009 |
|
|||||
Andrew Lawrence Pearce | Trustee | 29 May 1998 |
|
|||||
Ruth Mary Saltmarsh | Trustee | 26 April 1991 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £235.97k | £174.84k | £218.49k | £435.25k | £186.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.30k | £219.54k | £390.59k | £187.00k | £225.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.59k | £6.32k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATED BY SCHEME DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS AS THEY THINK FIT: A) IN PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE FROM PUBLIC FUNDS FOR THE HOME; B) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ANY CHILD OR YOUNG PERSON IN THE CARE OF THE COUNTY COUNCIL AT THE HOME; C) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ANY CHILD OR YOUNG PERON FORMERLY IN THE CARE OF OR UNDER THE CONTROL OF THE COUNTY COUNCIL AT THE HOME.
Area of benefit
DEVON AND NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 11 Davids Close
Sidbury
SIDMOUTH
EX10 0QS
- Phone:
- 07552992139
- Website:
-
northbrookcommunitytrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window