Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - WIDDRINGTON

Charity number: 228801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £4.00k £23.93k £12.83k £2.70k £3.09k
Total expenditure £3.28k £7.07k £7.09k £7.35k £6.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £10.67k N/A N/A