THE GATTY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gatty Hall functions as the centre of village life for the community of Ecclesfield and the surrounding area. Weekly activities on offer are badminton, ballroom dancing, hand bell ringers, Brownies, Guides, playgroup, toddler & mums group, craft workshop, mothers union, ladies group, line dancing, dancing class, local M.P. monthly surgery and ad hoc bookings. The trustees continue to provide a
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 14 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher John Harper | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Dawson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Cave | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Grice | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rodney Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Timothy Gill | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
RODGER FIDLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TOM PROCTOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.55k | £10.82k | £11.83k | £17.17k | £19.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.66k | £12.67k | £8.58k | £13.70k | £27.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 11 MAY 1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 15 FEBRUARY 1984 AND 6 JANUARY 2004
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE HOLDING AND USE OF CLASSES AND MEETINGS, CLUBS, INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND GUILDS IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARISH CHURCH. 2. AS A HOME FOR THE LIBRARY FOUNDED BY MISS A H EWING. 3. FOR GIVING CONCERNTS AND OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND ESPECIALLY AS A HOME FOR THE ECCLESFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY. 4. FOR ANY OTHER EDUCATIONAL RELIGIOUS OR LIKE PURPOSES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISHIONERS OF ECCLESFIELD.
Area of benefit
ECCLESFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 CHURCH STREET
ECCLESFIELD
SHEFFIELD
S35 9WE
- Phone:
- 01142452452
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window