KIRK HAMMERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 228844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide and maintain a hall for the use of residents and organisations in Kirk Hammerton for social, recreational or educational purposes.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £13,120
Total expenditure: £4,694

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • READING ROOM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN KATHERINE DAVIS BLACKBURN Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
MARK AMSDEN Trustee 18 November 2024
None on record
CARYS HARRISON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £6.56k £21.56k £9.68k £13.25k £13.12k
Total expenditure £26.29k £4.30k £2.48k £4.27k £4.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 05 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TULIP COTTAGE
KIRK HAMMERTON
YORK
YO26 8BX
Phone:
07790996603
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available