THE WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE LOANS FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve those in necessitious circumstances among serving or former members of the Force and their dependants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 01 April 1964: Standard registration
- 29 October 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 October 2014: Funds transferred to 505514 THE WEST YORKSHIRE POLICE BENEVOLENT AND LOANS FUN...
- THE WEST YORKSHIRE CONSTABULARY LOANS FUND (Previous name)
- THE WEST YORKSHIRE METROPOLITAN POLICE LOANS FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47 | £44 | £45 | £23 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £564 | £564 | £588 | £630 | £630 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 03 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 05 December 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 OCTOBER 1974 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 6 MARCH 1985, 6 APRIL 1987 AND 15 MAY 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE INTEREST FREE LOANS TO OFFICERS WHO ARE SERVING IN ANY POLICE FORCE FOR THE TIME BEING AND FROM TIME TO TIME MAINTAINED FOR AN AREA WHICH INCLUDES ANY PART OF THE AREA OF THE FORMER WEST YORKSHIRE CONSTABULARY AND WHO ARE IN TEMPRARY FINANCIAL DIFFICULTY.
Area of benefit
AREA OF THE FORMER WEST YORKSHIRE CONSTABULARY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window