Financial history THE VILLAGE HALL (FENCOTT AND MURCOTT)

Charity number: 228897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.11k £52.31k £18.40k £7.64k £9.38k
Total expenditure £7.79k £52.78k £9.55k £13.59k £7.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £44.95k £13.33k N/A N/A