NORTH WEST FRONTIER FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
103 Health 108 Religious activities 201 Children 202 Elderly 204 People of a particular ethnic or racial origin 304 Provide human resources 306 Provide services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Pakistan
Governance
- 22 May 1967: Standard registration
- 15 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.25k | £6.38k | £75.10k | £78.53k | £109 | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.38k | £160.69k | £6.25k | £77.53k | £10.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 11 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 25 July 2016 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 25 July 2016 | 25 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 30 June 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | 30 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 25 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | 28 June 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRINICIPLES AND PRACTICE DATED 1960 AS AMENDED 7 AUG 1990
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT IS TO PREACH THE GOSPEL IN NORTH-WEST PAKISTAN, AND ADJACENT COUNTRIES
Area of benefit
WEST PAKISTAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window