Financial history PROPHETIC WITNESS MOVEMENT INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 228941
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £55.56k £100.97k £79.20k £74.13k £87.00k
Total expenditure £86.30k £87.05k £93.08k £88.98k £84.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A