Accounts and annual returns THE RIFLEMEN'S AID SOCIETY

Charity number: 228955
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2008 24 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 04 November 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 28 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 16 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 16 December 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2004 09 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 04 February 2005 4 days late