THE HOLMBURY ST MARY VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision (and related care and maintenance) of a village hall in Holmbury St Mary, Surrey.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 July 1963: Standard registration
- HOLMBURY ST MARY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- THE HOLMBURY ST MARY WOMEN'S INSTITUTE HALL AND SITE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Rice | Chair | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Russell John Findlay | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Brian Clay | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann Kingsley | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pasquale Sena | Trustee | 26 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Justin scott Emrich | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Dougall | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.56k | £4.14k | £24.76k | £30.08k | £25.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.71k | £10.85k | £16.25k | £13.68k | £14.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.73k | N/A | £18.79k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED 20 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HOLMBURY ST MARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holmbury St. Mary Village Hall
Felday Glade
Holmbury St. Mary
DORKING
Surrey
RH5 6PG
- Phone:
- 01306640331
- Email:
- Justin.emrich@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window