Financial history THE COMPANY OF MERCHANT TAYLORS OF THE CITY OF YORK

Charity number: 229067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £84.38k £99.85k £137.25k £88.09k £118.08k
Total expenditure £84.75k £98.63k £92.95k £96.21k £98.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.64k £27.13k £5.63k N/A N/A