THE COMPANY OF MERCHANT TAYLORS OF THE CITY OF YORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Merchant Taylors maintain the 14th century guild hall (making it available for use by the public) and conduct the dayt to day business of the guild. Financial grants are made to needy young people from the York area to assist their advancement in the fields of art, craftsmanship and music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of York
Governance
- 23 October 1963: Standard registration
- MERCHANT TAYLORS - YORK (Working name)
- MERCHANT TAYLORS CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE COMPANY OF MERCHANT TAYLORS OF THE CITY OF YORK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.38k | £99.85k | £137.25k | £88.09k | £118.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.75k | £98.63k | £92.95k | £96.21k | £98.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.64k | £27.13k | £5.63k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ANCIENT CHARTER AND TRUST DEED OF 1ST MARCH 1945
Charitable objects
1)THE MAINTENANCE OF THE COMPANY'S HALL AND ALMSHOUSES. 2)THE PAYMENT OF PENSIONS TO DECAYED TAILORS OF THE CITY OF YORK OR THE SUBURBS 3)IN OR TOWARDS SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR AND DESERVING PERSONS OF THE SAID CITY AND SUBURBS AS ARE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF YORK AND SUBURBS
Linked charities
- 23 October 1963 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Merchant Taylors Hall
Aldwark
YORK
YO1 7BX
- Phone:
- 01904624889
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window