STRETTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise village events including a Summer party every year. The Hall is let to private organisations including exercise classes, arts & crafts, special interest groups and children's activities. We also hire out to individuals, mainly for parties and weddings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £12,845 from 12 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 01 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jenny Thompson | Chair | 08 August 2007 |
|
|
||||
Terence Lamb | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Gasco | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Gasco | Trustee | 20 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Coddington | Trustee | 15 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
George Thompson | Trustee | 06 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Joan Whileman | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mavis Ann Walker | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rosemary Ann Tomlinson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.35k | £15.88k | £7.82k | £11.33k | £12.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.26k | £21.72k | £5.63k | £12.82k | £12.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | £250 | £11.63k | N/A | £300 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 13 JUNE 1949
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR THE PURPOSE OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
STRETTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stretton Village Hall
MAIN ROAD
STRETTON
ALFRETON
DE55 6EW
- Phone:
- 07904622320
- Email:
- info@strettonvillagehall.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window