ARMITAGE WITH HANDSACRE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 229087
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

womens institutue part of the national federation of womwns institutes monthly meetings held speakers and activities and outings organized for the bennifit of the members. Involved with local and county issues.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007

Total income: £2,744
Total expenditure: £3,571

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 October 1963: Standard registration
  • 24 April 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - ARMITAGE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2006 31/12/2007
Total gross income £6.58k £2.36k £2.74k
Total expenditure £2.88k £2.78k £3.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 15 January 2009 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 04 February 2009 462 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 20 January 2009 447 days late
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 18 November 2005 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required