CHARITY OF MISS ELIZA CLUBLEY MIDDLETON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides grants to women of the Roman Catholic faith who are in financial hardship and live in the city and county of Kingston Upon Hull and the region within 10 miles of the boundaries thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 19 March 1964: Standard registration
- E C MIDDLETON CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- MISS E C MIDDLETON DECEASED (Working name)
- THE LATE MISS E C MIDDLETON'S TRUST FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Angela Ogilvie | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Pollock | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANNE TRYNKA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.62k | £4.54k | £4.99k | £5.34k | £4.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.00k | £21.76k | £25.44k | £25.08k | £21.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 19/07/1950 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2013 as amended on 11 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO OR THE PAYMENT OF PENSION TO POOR WOMEN OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON-UPON-HULL AND TEN MILES OF THE BOUNDARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Rollits LLP
Citadel House
58 High Street
HULL
HU1 1QE
- Phone:
- 01482 323239
- Email:
- Harriet.Wheeldon@rollits.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window