Financial history SKINNERGATE ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 229186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £8.99k £9.18k £9.49k £12.89k £18.46k
Total expenditure £3.96k £3.09k £3.83k £4.10k £5.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A