WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - EASTCOMBE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A monthly meeting held in the village hall. Listening to a variety of speakers on different subjects. Running courses for members. Arranging outings for members
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 May 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Wright | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Harris | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harris | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Short | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Buxton | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Gardiner | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Brooks | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Carole Crane | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROL CHRISTINE LAMBERT | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ASHWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.48k | £843 | £3.92k | £2.23k | £4.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.39k | £1.54k | £4.33k | £3.30k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 09 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITIUTION AND RULES, CONVEYANCE DATED 18TH MARCH 1936
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
EASTCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chalfont
St. Mary's Way
Brownshill
Stroud
GL6 8SW
- Phone:
- 441453886697
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window