Charity overview THE EAST INDIA STOCK TRUST
Charity Number: 268060-6
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL DATED 12 JULY 1791 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 3 FEBRUARY 1882 AND 20 DECEMBER 1929
Charitable objects
TO PAY THE INCOME TOWARDS THE SUPPORT AND MAINTAINANCE OF THE MINISTERS OR TEACHERS FOR THE TIME BEING (AND IF NONE IN PAYMENT OF VISITING MINISTER'S FEES) OF THE SEVERAL CONGREGATIONS OF PROTESTANT DISSENTERS CALLED BAPTISTS WHO DO NOT REFUSE GENERAL COMMUNION AT THE LORDS SUPPER MEETING AT BUCKLAND, BURFORD, CAMBRIDGE, COATE, CIRENCESTER, CLAPHAM, COLNBROOK, FAIRFORD, FARINGDON, KINGSTON LISLE, LINGFIELD, OXFORD, BEECH HILL (STRATFIELDSAYE), STRATTON, NEW MAZE POND CHURCH, CAMBERWELL AND WOKINGHAM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 30 December 1974: Standard registration
- 22 September 2010: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.