Financial history HAVANT COUNCIL OF COMMUNITY SERVICE

Charity number: 229351
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 30/06/2012
Total gross income £781.15k £837.75k £933.24k £893.07k £917.39k
Total expenditure £767.27k £807.44k £802.92k £906.24k £1.00m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £255.14k £332.03k £429.46k £363.32k £244.29k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £520.90k £502.22k £502.80k £529.45k £672.60k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.97k £3.38k £428 £297 £502
Income - Other £138 £126 £560 £4 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £513.42k £574.59k £570.72k £674.05k £701.20k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £100.36k £91.11k £82.46k £87.48k £100.95k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £153.49k £141.74k £149.74k £144.71k £198.99k