Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - KENNINGTON

Charity number: 229403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £23.02k £27.52k £24.29k £33.93k £47.57k
Total expenditure £28.62k £28.56k £16.23k £26.53k £51.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £9.51k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.20k £1.00k £9.51k