Trustees TOWN LANDS
Charity number: 229469

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Esse | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev David Karoon | Trustee | 05 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
DEREK ROBERT BARNES | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|||||||
Daphne Olive Cranwell | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
Susan Ann Cooke | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
Raymond Michael Hudson | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.