INTERNATIONAL PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IPPF is both a service provider and an advocate of sexual and reproductive health and rights. With a worldwide network of 152 Member Associations and active in 172 countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£97,337,744
Donations and legacies | £46.32m | |
Charitable activities | £48.47m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £2.51m | |
Other | £33.63k |
Total expenditure:
£98,920,622
Raising funds | £1.47m | |
Charitable activities | £97.37m | |
Other | £79.97k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £16,149,473 from 1 government contract(s) and £2,250,000 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.55m | |
Charitable expenditure | £97.37m |
People

264 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 20 |
£70k to £80k | 18 |
£80k to £90k | 12 |
£90k to £100k | 8 |
£100k to £110k | 6 |
£110k to £120k | 7 |
£120k to £130k | 4 |
£130k to £140k | 3 |
£140k to £150k | 6 |
£150k to £200k | 3 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Afghanistan
- Albania
- Algeria
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Denmark
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Ireland
- Israel
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Lithuania
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Moldova
- Mongolia
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Puerto Rico
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- São Tomé And Principe
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 08 August 1963: Standard registration
- I P P F (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Gilmore | Chair | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rathnamala M Desai | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ammar Al Salama | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Perdomo | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karina Vartanova | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daren Paul Katigbak | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rada Dimitrova Valchanova | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Mwebesa | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Karleiv Andreas Lomoy | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayathe Ayeva | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Rose-Marie Antoine | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sami Natsheh | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ulukbek Batyrgaliev | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Schaffer | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isaac Adewole | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.09m | £121.52m | £119.96m | £97.84m | £97.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.22m | £116.71m | £108.26m | £100.21m | £98.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £47.50m | N/A | £36.82m | £23.31m | £16.15m | |
|
Income from government grants | £47.50m | £55.30m | N/A | £2.25m | £2.25m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £324.00k | £48.03m | £48.79m | £46.32m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £56.05k | £175.00k | £65.04k | £322.85k | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £130.05m | £120.36m | £71.55m | £47.94m | £48.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £418.74k | £167.00k | £49.14k | £554.32k | £2.51m | |
|
Income - Other | £559.65k | £497.00k | £266.76k | £228.33k | £33.63k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £438.80k | £146.87k | £3.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £125.82m | £114.19m | £106.09m | £99.13m | £97.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.18m | £2.52m | £2.17m | £1.08m | £1.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £1.00k | £360.02k | £518.75k | £563.23k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £84.71m | £79.83m | £67.29m | £64.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £212.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £79.97k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £15.77m | £14.64m | £14.88m | £14.84m | £13.99m | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.20m | £2.04m | £2.07m | £2.19m | £2.36m | |
|
Other assets | £72.27m | £72.27m | £78.32m | £80.02m | £75.22m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £8.21m | -£9.09m | -£3.61m | -£3.78m | -£2.64m | |
|
Total liabilities | £20.34m | £17.91m | £15.56m | £16.71m | £16.96m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INTERNATIONAL PLANNED PARENTHOOD ACT 22 JULY 1977, AS AMENDED MAY 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE COUNTRIES OF THE WORLD IN FAMILY PLANNING AND RESPONSIBLE PARENTHOOD IN THE INTERESTS OF FAMILY WELFARE, COMMUNITY WELL BEING AND INTERNATIONAL GOODWILL. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF THE ACT).
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
I P P F
4 NEWHAMS ROW
LONDON
SE1 3UZ
- Phone:
- 02079398200
- Email:
- info@ippf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window