HAVERING LEARNING DISABILITY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SOCIETY IS A CHARITY ESTABLISHED FOR THE CARE, WELFARE AND IN THE INTERESTS AND ADVANCEMENT OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 02 September 1963: Standard registration
- HAVERING L D SOCIETY (Working name)
- HAVERING MENCAP (Previous name)
- SOUTH ESSEX SOCIETY FOR THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED (FORMERLY SOUTH ESSEX SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA KILLION | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Linda Caroline Kirby | Trustee | 29 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Johns | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Hamilton | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Kirby | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Julie Foreland | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Creighton Metcalf Burridge | Trustee | 22 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian John Burridge | Trustee | 26 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRACE WOODS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Brian David Clements | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.90k | £38.03k | £41.20k | £50.67k | £44.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.00k | £11.77k | £34.65k | £51.10k | £65.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 10 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND CONSTITUTION OF SOCIETY AS AMENDED 25TH JANUARY 2003 as amended on 29 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST, EDUCATION, TREATMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF MENTALLY HANDICAPPED PERSONS IN THE BOROUGHS OF ROMFORD, ILFORD, BARKING, DAGENHAM, HORNCHURCH AND BRENTWOOD.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
VICTORIA HALL
91 Victoria Road
ROMFORD
RM1 2LT
- Phone:
- 07504016837
- Email:
- hlds1948@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window