Trustees EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 229488
Charity reporting is up to date (53 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susanna Way Chair 24 May 2021
None on record
Jane Stephens Trustee 23 September 2024
None on record
Gillian Valerie Norman Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
Hilary Lewis Trustee 24 June 2024
THE SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS
Received: On time
THE SUSSEX ASSOCIATION FOR SPINA BIFIDA AND HYDROCEPHALUS
Received: On time
MOIRA COOK Trustee 01 April 2024
EYE AND DISTRICT VOLUNTEER CENTRE CIO
Received: 10 days late
JULIE GWYNETH ARIS Trustee 01 March 2023
THE EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Charity reporting is overdue by 246 days
Linda Jane Hayler Trustee 01 March 2022
THE EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Charity reporting is overdue by 246 days
EASTBOURNE AND DISTRICT PRESERVATION TRUST LTD
Received: On time
Elizabeth Audrey Lash Trustee 24 May 2021
THE EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Charity reporting is overdue by 246 days
GLENYS SUSAN DAVIES Trustee
EASTBOURNE GILBERT AND SULLIVAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE EAST SUSSEX FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO
Charity reporting is overdue by 246 days