WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - MARNHULL
Charity number: 229495
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2008
Total income: £2,079
Total expenditure: £2,257
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Dorset
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 October 1963: Standard registration
- 19 March 2009: Removed (Voluntary removal)
Organisation type:
Other names:
- THE W I (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2004 | 28/02/2005 | 28/02/2006 | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.30k | £1.90k | £1.84k | £2.58k | £2.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.58k | £2.09k | £1.64k | £2.29k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 09 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 10 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2004 | 26 July 2005 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTITUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
MARNHULL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window