BARBER'S RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial assistance to local schools
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnsley
Governance
- 14 October 1963: Standard registration
- BARBER'S ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon Howard | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Alice Cave | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Trevor Cave | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|||||
BRIAN HEMSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £326 | £339 | £321 | £314 | £394 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 DECEMBER 1977
Charitable objects
1 TO PAY TO THE EXISTING PENSIONER OF THE CHARITY SUCH YEARLY PENSION AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DECIDED. 2 TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF DARTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF DARTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
339 DARTON LANE
MAPPLEWELL
BARNSLEY
S75 6AW
- Phone:
- 01226385656
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window