EAST KENT PLOUGHING MATCH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To encourage those employed in Agriculture and to award prizes for skills in ploughing with Tractors, Vintage & Horses, also for excellence in Crop Husbandry. The Charity also aims to educate the general public in the fundamentals of Agriculture and to impart a greater understanding on the relationship between Farming and the Environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

34 Trustee(s)
37 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 03 April 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
34 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICK OVERY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Lyon | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Woolley | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Moir | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Smith | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mo Ovenden | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Kenton | Trustee | 28 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Plumptre | Trustee | 28 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Loder-Symonds | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Giles HIRST | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Spanton | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Dean | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Cocks | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stickells | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Paterson | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Scott Whitehead | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ledger | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Phillip Barker | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Solley | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE WELHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW EDWARD KERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GEOFF PRESTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN ROBERT MUMMERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MATHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON TIMOTHY PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES LEDGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN LAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL STEWART DUNN | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL JOHN PLOMMER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEREMY MCCABE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NICK PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES CAMERON WEIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GEOFF CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNIE BARTLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.10k | £39.50k | £48.77k | £55.93k | £52.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £31.93k | £38.39k | £42.58k | £42.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES
Charitable objects
THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THOSE EMPLOYED IN AGRICULTURE AND FOR AWARDING PRIZES FOR SKILL IN AGRICULTURAL PURSUITS
Area of benefit
EAST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Pineham Bottom Cottages
Pineham
DOVER
CT15 5HB
- Phone:
- 07866006841
- Email:
- ekploughingmatch@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window