WOOLTON EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The award of grants to organisations to assist them in in providing specific benefits of an educational and recreational nature to the public of Woolton, Liverpool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 11 November 1963: Standard registration
- WOOLTON VILLAGE CLUB (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM KELLY | Chair |
|
||||||
Ruth Lillian BENNETT | Trustee | 25 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
LYNNIE HINNIGAN | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
COLIN WINDROW | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MACE | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.77k | £12.88k | £12.05k | £11.98k | £11.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.46k | £15.00k | £0 | £25.13k | £10.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28TH AUGUST 1997 AND ORDER OF 9 AUGUST 2006 ALSO AN ORDER DATED 9TH AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
FOR EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATION PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOOLTON AND THE NEIGHBORHOOD WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
WOOLTON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Liverpool City Council
Cunard Building
Water Street
LIVERPOOL
L3 1AH
- Phone:
- 01512330470
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window