THE ABBEYFIELD (FORMBY) SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sefton
Governance
- 27 November 1963: Standard registration
- 08 February 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 08 February 2006: Funds transferred to 200719 THE ABBEYFIELD SOCIETY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £220.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 27 April 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 27 April 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF AOSSOCIATION DATED 25TH JUNE 1962
Charitable objects
TO HOUSE LONELY OLD PEOPLE WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE ON THEIR OWM, AND IN SO DOING TO PROVIDE A FOCAL POINT FOR THE GOODWILL AND KINDNESS OF NEIGHBOURNS
Area of benefit
FORMBY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window