MURPHY-NEUMANN CHARITY COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 May 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK JEROME LOCKETT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Supamon Chaiyakul Holmes | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAULA CHRISTOPHER | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARCUS RICHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.82k | £66.08k | £75.49k | £75.79k | £78.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.20k | £72.10k | £79.56k | £80.28k | £82.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORADUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 27TH MARCH 1963
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF AGED IMPOTENT AND POOR PERSONS IN GREAT BRITAIN AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE COMPANY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (FOR DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES DATED 27TH MARCH 1963).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAYLING COTTAGE
UPPER STREET
STRATFORD ST. MARY
COLCHESTER
CO7 6JW
- Phone:
- 01206323685
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window