HECKINGTON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity Number: 229574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the charity is to provide housing for poor people of at least 60 years of age resident in Heckington and certain defined villages

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £28,123
Total expenditure: £22,954

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 January 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY THOMAS Chair
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Mark Sardeson Trustee 14 June 2018
THE PELL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 565 days
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Michael A Hardy Trustee 18 August 2016
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Brenda Ward Trustee 06 October 2015
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Sally Pinchbeck Trustee 01 June 2013
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev CHRISTOPHER HARRINGTON Trustee 28 May 2012
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
THE SWATON COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 292 days
POOR'S ALLOTMENTS (ALSO KNOWN AS HALE PARVA POOR GARDENS CHARITY)
Received: On time
LAND RENTS OTHERWISE CHURCH FIELD OR CHURCH CLOSE
Received: On time
POORS LAND HELPRINGHAM
Received: On time
MRS C LEAVISS Trustee
HECKINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £26.13k £25.91k £26.83k £32.21k £28.12k
Total expenditure £24.96k £13.04k £32.82k £28.83k £22.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 10 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 10 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

10 July 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 09 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 07 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
12 St. Andrews Street
Heckington
SLEAFORD
NG34 9RE
Phone:
01529660852
Website:

12StAndrewsStreet.HeckingtonSleaford.NG349RE