WIDEOPEN AND NORTH GOSFORTH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate Daverson Hall, Open to the community to hire in order to advance community cohesion.The venue is used as a polling station. As well this the premises are used by :- Fitness Groups, Weight Management and lifestyle groups, Child development, Martial Arts, Community Socialising groups. The Charity is also raising money for the provision of Defibrillators for the locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £247 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 28 November 1963: Standard registration
- WIDEOPEN AND NORTH GOSFORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE MCRAE PHILIPSON | Chair | 09 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP DODD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David Watson | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.71k | £22.34k | £26.64k | £42.16k | £43.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.67k | £15.31k | £21.69k | £55.35k | £38.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £691 | £222 | £247 | £247 | £247 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.30k | £16.38k | £5.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION 18TH MAY, 1951 (AMENDED 15TH FEBRUARY, 1952) as amended on 29 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELL-BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN WIDEOPEN NORTH GOSFORTH AND DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE NEIGHBOURHOOD") BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY YOUTH AND ADULT ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO FURTHER HEALTH, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION, AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT, AND TO FOSTER A COMMUNITY SPIRIT FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE AND OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
WIDEOPEN AND NORTH GOSFORTH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holmwood
Woodlands Park
North Gosforth
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE13 6PG
- Phone:
- 07484876956
- Email:
- contactus@daversonhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window