Financial history TYDD ST GILES COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 229621
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £17.85k £17.48k £23.91k £28.12k £29.05k
Total expenditure £18.92k £18.30k £4.58k £21.06k £20.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.71k £2.67k N/A