TYDD ST GILES COMMUNITY CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community centre and recreation ground for the inhabitants of Tydd St Giles and the neighbourhood
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 01 January 1968: Standard registration
- TYDD ST GILES VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm John Carter | Chair | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Clifton | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Livings | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terry Brown | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paula Mallett | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Hubbard | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Barton | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Pearl | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pateman | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Newman | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Bell | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerald Seabrook | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Doyle | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Chapman | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jordan | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Rex Mallett | Trustee | 11 December 1993 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ware | Trustee | 11 December 1993 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE ROWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE ROWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.85k | £17.48k | £23.91k | £28.12k | £29.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.92k | £18.30k | £4.58k | £21.06k | £20.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.71k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4TH MAY 1967 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 9TH FEBRUARY 1993 as amended on 26 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
(1)THE PROVISION OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF TYDD ST.GILES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AMD FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS(2)LAND AND BUILDINGS BELONGING TO THE CHARITY SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUSTFOR THE PURPOSE OF A VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION FIELD AS AFORESAID
Area of benefit
TYDD ST. GILES AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9D Field Avenue
Tydd St. Giles
WISBECH
Cambridgeshire
PE13 5LJ
- Phone:
- 01945 871366
- Email:
- mjcarter.357@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window